09/20/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 09/12/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 09/12/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 09/12/2024 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call # 228 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2929 | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 07/29/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 146 ) | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | New draft of H4564 | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Pending new draft of H4564 | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |