House | 12/23/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Amended (Mark) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2990 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 10/10/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/10/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/10/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/16/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 08/16/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 08/15/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |