House | 10/15/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/23/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 09/04/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 09/09/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 08/16/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |