Senate | 12/09/2024 | Motion to lay the matter on the table negatived | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | Read, rules suspended and read a second time | ||
House | 11/25/2024 | Motion to reconsider negatived | ||
House | 11/25/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 11/25/2024 | Pending motion to suspend rules laid aside as moot | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | House adjourned under House Rule 82 until Friday, November 22, 2024, at 11:00am, in an informal session | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Quorum doubted | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Motion to suspend rules pending | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | New draft of H5099 | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Pending new draft of H5099 | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |