House | 12/19/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/19/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/19/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 12/16/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 12/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 12/09/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |