House | 04/29/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Accompanied by S380 | ||
Joint | 03/31/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |