House | 05/06/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 06/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |