LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H69
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H69
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H69
Action History
House
03/25/2024
Discharged to the committee on House Rules
House
02/22/2024
Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Joint
07/05/2023
Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Joint
07/05/2023
Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Senate
02/16/2023
Senate concurred
House
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity