House | 07/01/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4810 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday June 28, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 06/07/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |