House | 07/29/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4924 | ||
Senate | 07/15/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/01/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday July 26, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Joint | 07/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |