Senate | 04/08/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Accompanied by S375 and H626 | ||
Joint | 05/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |