Senate | 05/16/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Accompaied by H2000 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Joint | 09/24/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |