House | 09/05/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H5014 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Joint | 06/29/2023 | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD | ||
Joint | 06/29/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |