02/06/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 04/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |