Senate | 12/19/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2994 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Accompanied by H3611 | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Joint | 06/27/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |