House | 05/09/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Accompanied by H2152 | ||
Joint | 09/18/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 09/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |