Senate | 05/02/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/11/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs | ||
Joint | 06/23/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |