House | 07/24/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 07/19/2024 | Amendment (changing reporting date to Tuesday December 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 07/19/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 07/02/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday July 19, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 05/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |