Senate | 06/21/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2822 | ||
Senate | 06/21/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 05/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |