Senate | 01/04/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2542 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Order relative to subject matter adopted | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, S2542 | ||
Senate | 07/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |