House | 07/31/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #58 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Read third | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/24/2023 | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
Senate | 07/24/2023 | Order relative to subject matter adopted | ||
Senate | 07/24/2023 | Committee recommended ought to pass | ||
Senate | 07/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |