Senate | 05/22/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Accompanied by H3454 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |