Senate | 07/19/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see S2882 | ||
Senate | 07/15/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/01/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday July 22, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |