06/01/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read; and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 03/30/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |