Senate | 07/25/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2893 | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2893 | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 07/21/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |