09/22/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 09/11/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | New draft (O'Connor) of S1710 |