Senate | 05/09/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2770 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday May 6, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 10/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |