House | 02/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |