House | 04/29/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see S2612 | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 12/26/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |