Joint | 06/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 06/10/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 20, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Hearing rescheduled to 02/27/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 02/15/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |