03/22/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | New draft (Finegold) of S2485 |