Senate | 06/10/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | New draft of S678 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |