Senate | 04/22/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see S2735 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 02/16/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 02/20/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |