Senate | 04/25/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 03/28/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2024 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Returned from the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |