Senate | 06/21/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2831 | ||
Joint | 06/03/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity | ||
Joint | 05/02/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |