Senate | 07/18/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2878 | ||
Senate | 07/18/2024 | Read third (title changed) | ||
Senate | 07/18/2024 | Taken out of the Notice Section | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 05/21/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2024 from 01:00 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |