LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S2769
Action History
MA
Massachusetts Senate Bill S2769
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts Senate Bill S2769
Action History
Senate
06/06/2024
Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Joint
05/10/2024
Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
House
05/06/2024
House concurred
Senate
04/01/2024
Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
Senate
04/01/2024
Rules suspended
Senate
02/29/2024
Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently