House | 12/23/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 09/19/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 07/22/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 07/17/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 07/15/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |