Senate | 04/01/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2629 | ||
Joint | 02/01/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Joint | 01/31/2024 | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD | ||
Joint | 05/10/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |