House | 08/29/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H5012 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 28th, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday May 17, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 10/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |