House | 05/09/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 | ||
Joint | 06/05/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Joint | 06/02/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 06/02/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 05/31/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |