Senate | 04/18/2024 | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Accompanied by H159 | ||
Joint | 10/03/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |