Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H1035 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 2893 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
33 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1035
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 David M. Rogers
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act to improve plastic bottles and their recycling.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:David M. Rogers24th Middlesex1/16/2025 1 of 6
1616 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 2893 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
1717 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1035
1818 By Representative Rogers of Cambridge, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 1035) of
1919 David M. Rogers relative to the sale of single-use beverage containers and the minimum content
2020 standard for plastic beverage containers. Environment and Natural Resources.
2121 [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
2222 SEE HOUSE, NO. 889 OF 2023-2024.]
2323 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2424 _______________
2525 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2626 (2025-2026)
2727 _______________
2828 An Act to improve plastic bottles and their recycling.
2929 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
3030 of the same, as follows:
3131 1 The General Laws are hereby amended by inserting after chapter 21O the following
3232 2chapter:
3333 3 CHAPTER 21P.
3434 4 IMPROVED PLASTIC BOTTLES AND INCREASED RECYCLING
3535 5 Section 1. Definitions. As used in this chapter, the following words shall have the
3636 6following meanings unless the context clearly requires otherwise:
3737 7 A. “Beverage”, any of the following products prepared for immediate consumption
3838 8and sold in a single-use container: 2 of 6
3939 9 i. Beer and malt beverages; wine distilled spirit coolers; carbonated water and soda;
4040 10noncarbonated water; carbonated soft drinks; noncarbonated soft drinks and ‘soft’ drinks; non-
4141 11carbonated fruit drinks that contain any percentage of fruit juice and vegetable juice; coffee and
4242 12tea drinks; carbonated fruit drinks; vegetable and fruit juice, sports drinks, fermented non-
4343 13alcoholic drinks;
4444 14 B. “Beverage cap”, a cap on any plastic beverage container that is made wholly or in
4545 15large part from plastic;
4646 16 C. “Plastic beverage container”, an individual, separate bottle, can, jar, carton, or
4747 17other receptacle, however denominated, in which one liter or less of a beverage is sold, and that
4848 18is constructed of plastic. “Beverage container” does not include a cup or other similar container
4949 19open or loosely sealed receptacle;
5050 20 D. “The Department” means the Department of Environmental Protection for the
5151 21Commonwealth of Massachusetts;
5252 22 E. “Plastic”, an organic or petroleum derivative synthetic or a semisynthetic organic
5353 23solid that is moldable, and to which additives or other substances may have been added, with the
5454 24exception of natural polymers that have not been chemically modified;
5555 25 F. “Postconsumer recycled plastic” means plastic that would otherwise be destined
5656 26for solid waste disposal, having completed its intended end-use and product life cycle;
5757 27 G. “Product manufacturer” means any person, partnership, association, corporation
5858 28or any other entity that, through its own action or through contract or control, is primarily 3 of 6
5959 29responsible for causing a product to be produced that is held inside of a rigid plastic packaging
6060 30container and sold or offered for sale in Massachusetts.
6161 31 i. The Department shall consider the following factors in identifying a product
6262 32manufacturer:
6363 33 1. The ownership of the brand name of the product in the beverage container;
6464 34 2. Primary control or influence over the design of the product in the beverage
6565 35container;
6666 36 3. Primary control or influence over the design specifications of the beverage
6767 37container;
6868 38 ii.Any entity that has a legally recognized corporate relationship (i.e.
6969 39parent/subsidiary or affiliate relationship) with a product manufacturer shall be allowed to
7070 40assume the responsibilities of the product manufacturer as they relate to the requirements of this
7171 41Act.
7272 42 H. “Retailer” means a person who sells a beverage in a beverage container to a
7373 43consumer;
7474 44 I. “Single use”, means intended for disposal after one use and used for serving or
7575 45transporting a prepared, ready-to-consume product, and is not intended for multiple trips or
7676 46rotations by being returned to the producer for refill or reused for the same purpose for which it
7777 47was conceived.
7878 48 Section 2. Prohibition. 4 of 6
7979 49 A. On and after January 1, 2024, a retailer shall not sell or offer for sale, in the state,
8080 50a single-use beverage container with a beverage cap, unless the container meets one of the
8181 51following conditions:
8282 52 i. The beverage cap is tethered to the container in a manner that prevents the
8383 53separation of the cap from the container when the cap is removed from the container;
8484 54 ii.The beverage cap includes an opening from which the beverage can be consumed
8585 55while the cap is screwed onto or otherwise contiguously affixed to the container;
8686 56 B. Metal caps or lids with plastic seals shall not be considered to be made from
8787 57plastic. Glass and metal beverage containers that have caps and lids made from plastic shall not
8888 58be included in this act;
8989 59 Section 3. Minimum Recycled Content for Plastic Beverage Containers.
9090 60 A. On and after January 1, 2024, a beverage container that is constructed from plastic
9191 61shall have a minimum content standard of 15 percent postconsumer recycled plastic. The
9292 62department may adjust the standards based on factors that shall include, but are not limited to, all
9393 63the following factors:
9494 64 i. Market conditions;
9595 65 ii.Supply;
9696 66 iii.Technology advancements;
9797 67 iv.Environmental considerations; 5 of 6
9898 68 B. A beverage container that is reused and refilled at least five times is exempt from
9999 69compliance with subdivision (A);
100100 70 C. On and after January 1, 2025, the initial minimum content standard set pursuant to
101101 71subdivision (A) shall not restrict the department’s ability to adjust the minimum content standard
102102 72for plastic beverage containers, but the department shall not adjust that minimum content
103103 73standard to less than 15 percent;
104104 74 D. On and after January 1, 2026, the initial minimum content standard for plastic
105105 75beverage containers set pursuant to subdivision (A) shall be increased to 20 percent. Pursuant to
106106 76subdivision (C), the department may adjust the minimum content standard for plastic beverage
107107 77containers, but the department shall not adjust that minimum content standard to less than 20
108108 78percent;
109109 79 E. On and after January 1, 2027, the initial minimum content standard for plastic
110110 80beverage containers set pursuant to subdivision (A) shall be increased to 25 percent. Pursuant to
111111 81subdivision (C), the department may adjust the minimum content standard for plastic beverage
112112 82containers, but the department shall not adjust that minimum content standard to less than 25
113113 83percent;
114114 84 F. A product manufacturer which produces plastic beverage containers shall submit
115115 85certification to the Department, under penalty of perjury, verifying whether it is in compliance
116116 86with subdivision (a), if requested by the Department.
117117 87 Section 4. Enforcement of Minimum Recycled Content for Plastic Beverage Containers. 6 of 6
118118 88 A. Non-compliance shall be considered a public offense, and the Department may
119119 89place fines of up to $100,000 on any product manufacturer found to be below the 15 percent
120120 90postconsumer recycled content threshold for plastic beverage containers;
121121 91 B. Any product manufacturer who provides false information on a certification of
122122 92compliance to the Department may be prosecuted for fraud by the state attorney general.