Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H1036 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3168 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
33 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1036
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 David M. Rogers
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act to incentivize the reduction of residential waste disposal.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:David M. Rogers24th Middlesex1/16/2025 1 of 3
1616 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3168 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
1717 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1036
1818 By Representative Rogers of Cambridge, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 1036) of
1919 David M. Rogers relative to residential solid waste disposal and the implementation of
2020 mandatory reporting standards for cities and towns. Environment and Natural Resources.
2121 [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
2222 SEE HOUSE, NO. 888 OF 2023-2024.]
2323 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2424 _______________
2525 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2626 (2025-2026)
2727 _______________
2828 An Act to incentivize the reduction of residential waste disposal.
2929 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
3030 of the same, as follows:
3131 1 SECTION 1. The [Commissioner of Commonwealth of Massachusetts’ Department of
3232 2Environmental Protection (“the Department”)] shall establish performance standards for the
3333 3reduction of residential municipal solid waste, as described below, to achieve the purposes of the
3434 4[Commonwealth’s Solid Waste Master Plan and Greenhouse Gas Reduction Plan] and to protect
3535 5the natural environment, preserve resources, achieve progress toward the [Commonwealth's]
3636 6goals to reduce greenhouse gases, save municipalities money, and create green jobs in the
3737 7commonwealth. The performance standards shall be promulgated by July 1, 2023.
3838 8 SECTION 2. The Department shall establish performance standards for mandatory
3939 9reporting of residential municipal solid waste with the goal of the ultimate reduction of solid
4040 10waste on the basis of pounds per capita disposed for any resident who receives solid waste 2 of 3
4141 11services from the municipality. By June 30 of each year, the municipality shall report to the
4242 12Department as per standards set by the Commissioner all required waste data for the prior
4343 13calendar year. At a bare minimum, the municipality shall report how many tons of solid waste
4444 14were disposed of by served residential units, and the total population served. The first reports
4545 15shall be due from municipalities by June 30, 2024.
4646 16 SECTION 3. If residents are disposing of more than 500 pounds per capita of waste per
4747 17year in a given municipality, that municipality shall be required to adopt a cost saving waste
4848 18reduction program within a year. That program may be any program that incentivizes waste
4949 19reduction or diversion and best complies with the Zero Waste International Alliance standard,
5050 20i.e., “The conservation of all resources by means of responsible production, consumption, reuse,
5151 21and recovery of all products, packaging, and materials, without burning them, and without
5252 22discharges to land, water, or air that threaten the environment or human health.”
5353 23 SECTION 4. If the Department makes a determination that a city or town has not met the
5454 24municipal solid waste reporting or implementation standards prescribed by the Department by
5555 25July 1, 2021, that city or town shall submit a report to the department setting forth the reasons
5656 26that the town did not meet the standards and detailing a plan to achieve the performance
5757 27standards by September 30, 2021. The Department shall issue a report on the municipal solid
5858 28waste programs not later than December 1 of each year that provides per capita solid waste
5959 29disposal statistics for the municipal solid waste programs and shall file the report with the clerks
6060 30of the senate and house of representatives and the senate and house chairs of the joint committee
6161 31on environment, natural resources and agriculture. The report may disaggregate solid waste
6262 32tonnage information to highlight categories of waste, including waste that is beyond the control
6363 33of a city or town such as waste created as a result of a natural disaster. 3 of 3
6464 34 SECTION 5. If the Department makes a determination that the cities and towns of the
6565 35Commonwealth have not reduced their residential waste per capita to less than 500 pounds on
6666 36average per person for all individuals served by residential municipal solid waste programs in the
6767 37Commonwealth by July 31, 2025, the Department shall be empowered to promulgate regulations
6868 38instituting a statewide program incentivizes waste reduction or diversion and best complies with
6969 39the Zero Waste International Alliance standard, i.e., “The conservation of all resources by means
7070 40of responsible production, consumption, reuse, and recovery of all products, packaging, and
7171 41materials, without burning them, and without discharges to land, water, or air that threaten the
7272 42environment or human health.” Furthermore, if future municipal reporting indicates that the
7373 43average residential solid waste disposed of per capita increases above 500 pounds per person per
7474 44year, the Commonwealth shall also promulgate regulations as described in this paragraph.