1 | 1 | | 1 of 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3396 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 223 |
---|
4 | 4 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
5 | 5 | | _________________ |
---|
6 | 6 | | PRESENTED BY: |
---|
7 | 7 | | Mindy Domb |
---|
8 | 8 | | _________________ |
---|
9 | 9 | | To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General |
---|
10 | 10 | | Court assembled: |
---|
11 | 11 | | The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: |
---|
12 | 12 | | An Act relative to a livable wage for human services workers. |
---|
13 | 13 | | _______________ |
---|
14 | 14 | | PETITION OF: |
---|
15 | 15 | | NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Mindy Domb3rd Hampshire1/17/2025 1 of 4 |
---|
16 | 16 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3396 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 223 |
---|
18 | 18 | | By Representative Domb of Amherst, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 223) of Mindy |
---|
19 | 19 | | Domb relative to a livable wage for human services workers. Children, Families and Persons |
---|
20 | 20 | | with Disabilities. |
---|
21 | 21 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
22 | 22 | | _______________ |
---|
23 | 23 | | In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2025-2026) |
---|
25 | 25 | | _______________ |
---|
26 | 26 | | An Act relative to a livable wage for human services workers. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority |
---|
28 | 28 | | of the same, as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | 1 SECTION 1. Chapter 6A of the General Laws, as so appearing in the 2022 Official |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2Edition, is hereby amended by adding the following section:- |
---|
31 | 31 | | 3 Section 105. (a) As used in this section, the following words shall, unless the context |
---|
32 | 32 | | 4clearly requires otherwise, have the following meanings: |
---|
33 | 33 | | 5 “Human service provider,” a community-based human services organization with a |
---|
34 | 34 | | 6human services program funded by the Executive Office of Health and Human Services, the |
---|
35 | 35 | | 7Executive Office of Elder Affairs or the Executive Office of Housing and Livable Communities. |
---|
36 | 36 | | 8 “Human services worker,” an employee of a human service provider who provides |
---|
37 | 37 | | 9treatment, support or services to clients or their families. 2 of 4 |
---|
38 | 38 | | 10 “Disparity amount,” the monetary calculation of the average difference in salary between |
---|
39 | 39 | | 11human services workers and 1) direct care workers, nurses, clinicians or other comparable |
---|
40 | 40 | | 12employees employed by the commonwealth’s state-operated programs for human services; |
---|
41 | 41 | | 13 “Rate,” the reimbursement rate paid by the Executive Office of Health and Human |
---|
42 | 42 | | 14Services, the Executive Office of Elder Affairs, the Executive Office of Housing and Livable |
---|
43 | 43 | | 15Communities or the Department of Early Education and Care to a human service provider to |
---|
44 | 44 | | 16deliver services to clients on the Commonwealth’s behalf. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 17 (b) Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, the Executive Office of |
---|
46 | 46 | | 18Health and Human Services, the Executive Office of Elder Affairs and the Executive Office of |
---|
47 | 47 | | 19Housing and Livable Communities shall increase the rate of reimbursement for human services |
---|
48 | 48 | | 20providers by an amount that reduces the disparity amount, as defined by subsection (a), to: |
---|
49 | 49 | | 21 50 percent on or before July 1, 2026 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 22 30 percent on or before July 1, 2027 |
---|
51 | 51 | | 23 10 percent on or before July 1, 2028 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 24 Zero percent on or before July 1, 2029, and shall remain at 0 percent thereafter |
---|
53 | 53 | | 25 (c) All increases in the rate of reimbursement provided for in this section shall be used to |
---|
54 | 54 | | 26increase the compensation of human services workers. |
---|
55 | 55 | | 27 (d) The Executive Office of Health and Human Services, the Executive Office of |
---|
56 | 56 | | 28Administration and Finance, the Executive Office of Elder Affairs and the Executive Office of |
---|
57 | 57 | | 29Housing and Livable Communities shall adopt regulations to implement this section. 3 of 4 |
---|
58 | 58 | | 30 (e) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prohibit the elimination of the disparity |
---|
59 | 59 | | 31amount prior to July 1, 2028. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 32 SECTION 2. On or before July 1, 2025 and annually thereafter until the disparity amount |
---|
61 | 61 | | 33is eliminated for human services workers, the Executive Office of Health and Human Services, |
---|
62 | 62 | | 34the Executive Office of Elder Affairs and the Executive Office of Housing and Livable |
---|
63 | 63 | | 35Communities, in collaboration with the Massachusetts Council of Human Service Providers, |
---|
64 | 64 | | 36Inc., shall provide a report to the Senate and House Committees on Ways and Means, the Joint |
---|
65 | 65 | | 37Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities, the Joint Committee on Elder |
---|
66 | 66 | | 38Affairs, the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing, the Joint Committee on Mental Health, |
---|
67 | 67 | | 39Substance Use and Recovery, the Joint Committee on Public Health, and the Joint Committee on |
---|
68 | 68 | | 40State Administration and Regulatory Oversight that includes the following information: |
---|
69 | 69 | | 41 The current disparity amount, as defined in Subsection (a) of Section 105 of Chapter 6A |
---|
70 | 70 | | 42of the General Laws, between the salaries of human services workers, as defined in Subsection |
---|
71 | 71 | | 43a) of Section 105 of Chapter 6A of the General Laws, employed by human service providers, as |
---|
72 | 72 | | 44defined in Subsection (a) of Section 105 of Chapter 6A of the General Laws, and direct care |
---|
73 | 73 | | 45workers, nurses, clinicians or other comparable employees employed by the Commonwealth’s |
---|
74 | 74 | | 46state-operated programs for human services; |
---|
75 | 75 | | 47 The amount of annual increases in the rate of reimbursement, as defined in Subsection (a) |
---|
76 | 76 | | 48of Section 105 of Chapter 6A of the General Laws, to human service providers under contract |
---|
77 | 77 | | 49with their department necessary to reduce and eliminate the disparity amount by July 1, 2028 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 50pursuant to the schedule articulated in Subsection (b) of Section 105 of Chapter 6A of the |
---|
79 | 79 | | 51General Laws; 4 of 4 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 52 The amount needed to be appropriated annually to achieve the reductions in the disparity |
---|
81 | 81 | | 53amount described in paragraphs (1)-(4) of Subsection (b) of Section 105 of Chapter 6A of the |
---|
82 | 82 | | 54General Laws by July 1, 2028; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | 55 The implementation of rates necessary to eliminate the disparity amount by agency, job |
---|
84 | 84 | | 56description and start date of implementation. |
---|