Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H3145 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1326       FILED ON: 1/14/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3145
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Bradley H. Jones, Jr.
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/14/2025Kimberly N. Ferguson1st Worcester1/14/2025Paul K. Frost7th Worcester1/31/2025Todd M. Smola1st Hampden3/10/2025David F. DeCoste5th Plymouth1/28/2025David K. Muradian, Jr.9th Worcester1/29/2025Hannah Kane11th Worcester1/30/2025 1 of 2
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1326       FILED ON: 1/14/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3145
By Representative Jones of North Reading, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3145) of 
Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax. 
Revenue.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE HOUSE, NO. 2844 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act relative to the gradual elimination of the inventory tax.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as appearing 
2in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$2.60” and 
3inserting in place thereof the following figure:- $2.00. 
4 SECTION 2. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 
5appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$2.00” and inserting in place 
6thereof the following figure:- $1.50. 
7 SECTION 3. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 
8appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$1.50” and inserting in place 
9thereof the following figure:- $1.00.  2 of 2
10 SECTION 4. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 
11appearing, is hereby amended, in line 37, by striking the figure “$1.00” and inserting in place 
12thereof the following figure:- $.50. 
13 SECTION 5. Subsection (a) of section 39 of chapter 63 of the general laws, as so 
14appearing, is hereby amended by striking clause (1) and (2) and inserting in place thereof the 
15following:- 
16 “(1)(i) For tax years beginning before January 1, 2020, 9.5 per cent of its net income 
17determined to be taxable in accordance with this chapter; (ii) for tax years beginning on or after 
18January 1, 2010, but before January 1, 2021, 8.75 per cent of its net income determined to be 
19taxable in accordance with this chapter; (iii) for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, 
20but before January 1, 2022, 8.25 per cent of its net income determined to be taxable in 
21accordance with this chapter; or (iv) for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, 8.0 per 
22cent of its net income determined to be taxable in accordance with this chapter. 
23 SECTION 6. Section 1 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2026. 
24 SECTION 7. Section 2 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2027. 
25 SECTION 8. Section 3 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2028. 
26 SECTION 9. Section 4 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2029. 
27 SECTION 10. Section 5 of this act shall be effective on January 1, 2030.