1 | 1 | | 1 of 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1347 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3147 |
---|
4 | 4 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
5 | 5 | | _________________ |
---|
6 | 6 | | PRESENTED BY: |
---|
7 | 7 | | Bradley H. Jones, Jr. |
---|
8 | 8 | | _________________ |
---|
9 | 9 | | To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General |
---|
10 | 10 | | Court assembled: |
---|
11 | 11 | | The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: |
---|
12 | 12 | | An Act relative to the conservation land tax credit. |
---|
13 | 13 | | _______________ |
---|
14 | 14 | | PETITION OF: |
---|
15 | 15 | | NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/14/2025Kimberly N. Ferguson1st Worcester1/14/2025Paul K. Frost7th Worcester1/31/2025Todd M. Smola1st Hampden3/10/2025Hannah Kane11th Worcester1/28/2025David F. DeCoste5th Plymouth1/28/2025David K. Muradian, Jr.9th Worcester1/29/2025Steven George Xiarhos5th Barnstable1/30/2025James B. EldridgeMiddlesex and Worcester2/11/2025David T. Vieira3rd Barnstable2/24/2025Rodney M. Elliott16th Middlesex2/27/2025Mary S. Keefe15th Worcester3/4/2025 1 of 3 |
---|
16 | 16 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1347 FILED ON: 1/14/2025 |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3147 |
---|
18 | 18 | | By Representative Jones of North Reading, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3147) of |
---|
19 | 19 | | Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others relative to the conservation land tax credit. Revenue. |
---|
20 | 20 | | [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION |
---|
21 | 21 | | SEE HOUSE, NO. 2839 OF 2023-2024.] |
---|
22 | 22 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
23 | 23 | | _______________ |
---|
24 | 24 | | In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2025-2026) |
---|
26 | 26 | | _______________ |
---|
27 | 27 | | An Act relative to the conservation land tax credit. |
---|
28 | 28 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority |
---|
29 | 29 | | of the same, as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | 1 SECTION 1. Section 6 of chapter 62 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2Official Edition, is hereby amended by inserting after the word “amended”, in line 769, the |
---|
32 | 32 | | 3following words:- , or a private nonprofit trust established pursuant to chapter 203 organized for |
---|
33 | 33 | | 4the purposes of land conservation, which is authorized to do business in the commonwealth, and |
---|
34 | 34 | | 5which has tax-exempt status as a nonprofit charitable organization as described in section |
---|
35 | 35 | | 6501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended.. |
---|
36 | 36 | | 7 SECTION 2. Said section 6 of said chapter 62, as so appearing, is hereby further |
---|
37 | 37 | | 8amended by striking out, in line 835, the figure “$2,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
38 | 38 | | 9following figure:- $3,000,000. 2 of 3 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 10 SECTION 3. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out |
---|
40 | 40 | | 11the figure “$3,000,000”, inserted by section 40B, and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
41 | 41 | | 12figure:- $4,000,000. |
---|
42 | 42 | | 13 SECTION 4. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out, |
---|
43 | 43 | | 14in line 835, the figure “$4,000,000”, inserted by section 40C, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
44 | 44 | | 15following figure:- $5,000,000. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 16 SECTION 5. Said section 6 of said chapter 62 is hereby further amended by striking out |
---|
46 | 46 | | 17the figure “$5,000,000”, inserted by section 40D, and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
47 | 47 | | 18figure:- $2,000,000. |
---|
48 | 48 | | 19 SECTION 6. Section 38AA of chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended by |
---|
49 | 49 | | 20inserting after the word “amended”, in line 29, the following words:- , or a private nonprofit trust |
---|
50 | 50 | | 21established pursuant to chapter 203 organized for the purposes of land conservation, which is |
---|
51 | 51 | | 22authorized to do business in the commonwealth, and which has tax-exempt status as a nonprofit |
---|
52 | 52 | | 23charitable organization as described in section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, |
---|
53 | 53 | | 24as amended. |
---|
54 | 54 | | 25 SECTION 7. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended |
---|
55 | 55 | | 26by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$2,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
56 | 56 | | 27figure:- $3,000,000. |
---|
57 | 57 | | 28 SECTION 8. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended |
---|
58 | 58 | | 29by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$3,000,000” and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
59 | 59 | | 30figure:- $4,000,000. 3 of 3 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 31 SECTION 9. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended |
---|
61 | 61 | | 32by striking out, in line 88, the figure “$4,000,000.” and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
62 | 62 | | 33figure:- “$5,000,000” |
---|
63 | 63 | | 34 SECTION 10. Said section 38AA of said chapter 63 is hereby further amended by |
---|
64 | 64 | | 35striking out the figure “$5,000,000”, inserted by section 41D, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
65 | 65 | | 36following figure:- $2,000,000. |
---|
66 | 66 | | 37 SECTION 11. Sections 1, 2, 6 and 7 shall take effect on January 1, 2026. |
---|
67 | 67 | | 38 SECTION 12. Sections 3 and 8 shall take effect on January 1, 2027. |
---|
68 | 68 | | 39 SECTION 13. Sections 4 and 9 shall take effect on January 1, 2028. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 40 SECTION 14. Sections 5 and 10 of this act shall take effect on December 31, 2035. |
---|