1 of 1 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1448 FILED ON: 1/15/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3155 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _________________ PRESENTED BY: Hannah Kane _________________ To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General Court assembled: The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: An Act allowing for the deduction of business interest. _______________ PETITION OF: NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Hannah Kane11th Worcester1/15/2025 1 of 3 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 1448 FILED ON: 1/15/2025 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3155 By Representative Kane of Shrewsbury, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3155) of Hannah Kane relative to the income tax deduction of business interest. Revenue. [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION SEE HOUSE, NO. 2853 OF 2023-2024.] The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _______________ In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court (2025-2026) _______________ An Act allowing for the deduction of business interest. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority of the same, as follows: 1 SECTION 1. Section 1 of chapter 62 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 2Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking out subsection (c) and inserting in place thereof 3the following subsection: - 4 (c) “Code”, the Internal Revenue Code of the United States, as amended on January 1, 52022 and in effect for the taxable year; but Code shall mean the Code as amended and in effect 6for the taxable year for sections 62(a)(1), 72, 105, 106, 108(f)(5), 139C, 223, 274(m), 274(n), 7401 through 420, inclusive, 457, 529, 529A, 530, 951, 951A, 959, 961, 3401 and 3405 but 8excluding sections 402A and 408(q), and provided further that for purposes of determining the 9amount of business interest deductible under this chapter, the provisions of section 163(j) of the 10Code shall not apply. 2 of 3 11 SECTION 2. Section 1 of chapter 63 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 12Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking out the definition of “Code” therein and inserting 13in place thereof the following definition: - 14 “Code”, the Internal Revenue Code of the United States, as amended and in effect for the 15taxable year, unless otherwise provided; for section 163(j), Code shall mean the Code as 16amended and in effect for tax years beginning before January 1, 2018. 17 SECTION 3. Section 30 of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended by 18striking out the first sentence of paragraph 4 and inserting in place thereof the following 19sentence: - 20 “Net income”, gross income less the deductions, but not credits, allowable under the 21provisions of the Federal Internal Revenue Code, as amended and in effect for the taxable year; 22provided, however, that for section 163(j), Code shall mean the Code as amended and in effect 23for tax years beginning before January 1, 2018, and provided further that any deduction 24otherwise allowable which is allocable, in whole or in part, to one or more classes of income not 25included in a corporation’s taxable net income, as determined under subsection (a) of section 38, 26shall not be allowed. 27 SECTION 4. Section 30 of said chapter 63, as so appearing, is hereby amended by, 28striking the following words, “; and (viii) the deductions allowed by sections 245A, 250 and 29965(c) of the Code.”, and inserting in place thereof the following: - 30 (viii) the deductions allowed by sections 245A, 250 and 965(c) of the Code; and 3 of 3 31 (ix) For tax years commencing on or after January 1, 2025, no deduction shall be allowed 32resulting from a carryforward of disallowed business interest expense under section 163(j) of the 33Code. The amount of any carryforward of disallowed business interest expense under section 34163(j) of the Code as of the tax year ending before January 1, 2025, shall be allowed as a 35deduction in 3 equal parts over 3 consecutive years, beginning with the first tax year 36commencing on or after January 1, 2025. 37 SECTION 5. This act shall take effect for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 382025.