Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H341 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 575 FILED ON: 1/10/2025
33 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 341
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 Tackey Chan
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act extending live and simulcasted horse racing in the Commonwealth.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Tackey Chan2nd Norfolk1/10/2025 1 of 4
1616 HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 575 FILED ON: 1/10/2025
1717 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 341
1818 By Representative Chan of Quincy, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 341) of Tackey
1919 Chan for legislation to further regulate simulcasted horse racing. Consumer Protection and
2020 Professional Licensure.
2121 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2222 _______________
2323 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2424 (2025-2026)
2525 _______________
2626 An Act extending live and simulcasted horse racing in the Commonwealth.
2727 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
2828 of the same, as follows:
2929 1 SECTION 1. The first paragraph of section 12A of chapter 494 of the acts of 1978 is
3030 2hereby amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 7
3131 3of chapter 26 of the acts of 2023, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until
3232 4December 15, 2027.
3333 5 SECTION 2. The last paragraph of said section 12A of said chapter 494 is hereby
3434 6amended by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 8 of said chapter
3535 726, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027. 
3636 8 SECTION 3. The introductory paragraph of section 13 of said chapter 494 is hereby
3737 9amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 9 of said
3838 10chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2027. 2 of 4
3939 11 SECTION 4. Section 15 of said chapter 494 is hereby amended by striking out the words
4040 12“and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 10 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place
4141 13thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2027.
4242 14 SECTION 5. The first paragraph of section 9 of chapter 277 of the acts of 1986 is hereby
4343 15amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 11 of said
4444 16chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2027.
4545 17 SECTION 6. The first sentence of the first paragraph of section 3 of chapter 114 of the
4646 18acts of 1991 is hereby amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”,
4747 19inserted by section 12 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and
4848 20until December 15, 2027.
4949 21 SECTION 7. The last paragraph of said section 3 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5050 22by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 13 of said chapter 26, and
5151 23inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
5252 24 SECTION 8. The first paragraph of section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
5353 25striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 14 of said chapter 26,
5454 26and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2027.
5555 27 SECTION 9. The last paragraph of said section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5656 28by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 15 of said chapter 26, and
5757 29inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027. 3 of 4
5858 30 SECTION 10. The first paragraph of section 5 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
5959 31striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 16 of said chapter 26,
6060 32and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2027.
6161 33 SECTION 11. Section 45 of chapter 139 of the acts of 2001 is hereby amended by
6262 34striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 17 of said chapter 26, and
6363 35inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
6464 36 SECTION 12. Section 20 of chapter 449 of the acts of 2006 is hereby amended by
6565 37striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 18 of said chapter 26, and
6666 38inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
6767 39 SECTION 13. Section 92 of chapter 194 of the acts of 2011 is hereby amended by
6868 40striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 19 of said chapter 26, and
6969 41inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
7070 42 SECTION 14. Section 112 of said chapter 194 is hereby amended by striking out the
7171 43words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 20 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place
7272 44thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
7373 45 SECTION 15. Section 74 of chapter 10 of the acts of 2015 is hereby amended by striking
7474 46out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 21 of said chapter 26, and inserting in
7575 47place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2027.
7676 48 SECTION 16. Section 23 of chapter 26 of the acts of 2023 is hereby repealed.
7777 49 SECTION 17. Notwithstanding section 2 of chapter 128A of the General Laws, sections
7878 501, 2, 2A and 4 of chapter 128C of the General Laws and section 9 of said chapter 128C, as 4 of 4
7979 51inserted by section 6 of chapter 173 of the acts of 2022, or any other general or special law to the
8080 52contrary, the running race horse meeting licensee located in Suffolk county licensed to conduct
8181 53live racing pursuant to said chapter128A and simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C
8282 54in calendar year 2025 shall remain licensed as a running horse racing meeting licensee and shall
8383 55remain authorized to conduct simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C until December
8484 5615, 2027;provided, however, that the days between January 1, 2025 and December 31, 2027 shall
8585 57be dark days pursuant to said chapter 128C and the licensee shall be precluded from conducting
8686 58live racing during that period unless it applies for and is granted a supplemental live racing
8787 59license pursuant to said chapter 128A; provided further, that the licensee shall not simulcast or
8888 60accept a wager on greyhound dog racing on or after August 10, 2023 pursuant to section 9 of
8989 61chapter 128C of the General Laws; provided further, that all simulcasts shall comply with the
9090 62Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C. 3001et seq. or other applicable federal law;
9191 63provided further, that all simulcasts from states which have racing associations that do not
9292 64require approval in compliance with the Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C.
9393 653004(a)(1)(A) shall require the approval of the New England Horsemen’s Benevolent &
9494 66Protective Association prior to being simulcast to a racing meeting licensee within the
9595 67commonwealth; and provided further, that if the association agrees to approve the simulcast for 1
9696 68racing meeting licensee, it shall approve the simulcast for all otherwise eligible racing meeting
9797 69licensees.