Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H3454 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3190       FILED ON: 1/16/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3454
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Antonio F. D. Cabral
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to offshore wind.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Antonio F. D. Cabral13th Bristol1/16/2025 1 of 2
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3190       FILED ON: 1/16/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3454
By Representative Cabral of New Bedford, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3454) of 
Antonio F. D. Cabral relative to offshore wind energy generation. Telecommunications, Utilities 
and Energy.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE HOUSE, NO. 3147 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act relative to offshore wind.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Subsection (b) of section 83C of chapter 169 of the acts of 2008, as 
2amended by chapter 188 of the acts of 2016, as amended by chapter 179 of the acts of 2022, as 
3amended by chapter 239 of the acts of 2024, is hereby amended by striking out the figure 
4“5,600” and inserting in place thereof the following figure:- 8,000. 
5 SECTION 2. Subsection (b) of section 83C of chapter 169 of the acts of 2008, as 
6amended by chapter 188 of the acts of 2016, as amended by chapter 179 of the acts of 2022, as 
7amended by chapter 239 of the acts of 2024, is hereby further amended by striking out the 
8words:- "June 30, 2027" and inserting in place thereof the following words:- "March 31, 2027; 
9provided, however, that said distribution companies enter into cost effective long-term contracts  2 of 2
10for offshore wind energy generation equal to approximately 5,600 megawatts of aggregate 
11nameplate capacity not later than December 31, 2026". 
12 SECTION 3. Subsection (b) of section 83C of chapter 169 of the acts of 2008, as 
13amended by chapter 188 of the acts of 2016, as amended by chapter 179 of the acts of 2022, as 
14amended by chapter 239 of the acts of 2024, is hereby further amended by striking out the 
15words:- ", if applicable,". 
16 SECTION 4. Subsection (b) of section 83C of chapter 169 of the acts of 2008, as 
17amended by chapter 188 of the acts of 2016, as amended by chapter 179 of the acts of 2022, as 
18amended by chapter 239 of the acts of 2024, is hereby further amended by striking out the words 
19"24 months" and inserting in place thereof the following words:- "18 months."